Global Patent Index - EP 1163524 A2

EP 1163524 A2 2001-12-19 - METHODS OF SCREENING FOR COLORECTAL CANCER MODULATORS

Title (en)

METHODS OF SCREENING FOR COLORECTAL CANCER MODULATORS

Title (de)

SCREENINGVERFAHREN FÜR MODULATOREN VON DARMKREBS

Title (fr)

METHODES PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER DU CANCER COLO-RECTAL, COMPOSITIONS, ET METHODES PERMETTANT DE DETECTER DES MODULATEURS DU CANCER COLO-RECTAL

Publication

EP 1163524 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00916451 A

Priority

  • US 0007044 W
  • US 26886699 A
  • US 43698399 A
  • US 43594599 A
  • US 45085799 A
  • US 45385099 A
  • US 49344400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055633A2] Described herein are methods that can be used for diagnosis and prognosis of colorectal cancer. Also described herein are methods that can be used to screen candidate bioactive agents for the ability to modulate colorectal cancer. Additionally, methods and molecular targets (genes and their products) for therapeutic intervention in colorectal and other cancers are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/574; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/543

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/32 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/4748 (2013.01); G01N 33/5011 (2013.01); G01N 33/57419 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055633A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055633 A2 20000921; WO 0055633 A3 20010222; WO 0055633 A9 20011122; AU 3755300 A 20001004; CA 2369319 A1 20000921; EP 1163524 A2 20011219; JP 2004510951 A 20040408; MX PA01009369 A 20030606

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MACK, DAVID

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GISH, KURT, C.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILSON, KEITH, E.

2005-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MACK, DAVID

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GISH, KURT, C.

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILSON, KEITH, E.

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI