Global Patent Index - EP 1163599 A1

EP 1163599 A1 2001-12-19 - SOFTWARE RENTAL SYSTEM IN DISTRIBUTED NETWORKS

Title (en)

SOFTWARE RENTAL SYSTEM IN DISTRIBUTED NETWORKS

Title (de)

SOFTWARE-VERMIETUNGSSYSTEM IN VERTEILTEN NETZWERKEN

Title (fr)

SYST ME DE LOCATION DE LOGICIELS DANS DES R SEAUX DISTRIBU S

Publication

EP 1163599 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00902996 A

Priority

  • KR 0000076 W
  • KR 19990003481 A
  • KR 19990068380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0046685A1] A method for executing a rental software program in a distributed computing environment, wherein the rental software program includes a main executable file and optional files, includes the steps of: a) performing a communication connection between a user computer system and a server computer system, wherein the user computer system is based on a user-transparent program install-free technology; b) displaying a list of rental software programs downloaded from the server computer system; c) selecting a desirable rental software program in the list of rental software programs; d) downloading a main executable file associated with the desirable rental software program from the server computer system to run a process corresponding to the main executable file; and e) if the process needs one or more optional files, downloading the one or more optional files from the server computer system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G06F 21/10 (2013.01); G06Q 30/04 (2012.01); G06Q 30/06 (2012.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 50/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01); G06F 9/44521 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0046685 A1 20000810; AU 2463700 A 20000825; CN 1185591 C 20050119; CN 1354857 A 20020619; EP 1163599 A1 20011219; EP 1163599 A4 20070307; JP 2003532166 A 20031028; JP 4707837 B2 20110622; KR 20000057127 A 20000915; KR 20010101982 A 20011115

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100803

2008-02-27 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070529

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070529

2007-03-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 9/445 20060101AFI20070131BHEP

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE