Global Patent Index - EP 1163600 A1

EP 1163600 A1 2001-12-19 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING THE CAPABILITIES OF PERSONAL COMPUTERS

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING THE CAPABILITIES OF PERSONAL COMPUTERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER FÄHIGKEITEN VON PC'S

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET APPAREILS PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE LES CAPACITES D'ORDINATEURS PERSONNELS

Publication

EP 1163600 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914914 A

Priority

US 9905690 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055747A1] A fixed capability, both in hardware and software, of any PC can be temporarily enhanced by networking with a main frame (14) through a network (15) which permits any PC (13) to access the capabilities of the mainframe for limited period of time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/16; G06F 9/455

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/455 (2006.01); G06F 9/50 (2006.01); G06F 15/177 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/5027 (2013.01); G06F 9/45537 (2013.01); G06F 15/177 (2013.01); G06F 2209/509 (2013.01); G06F 2209/549 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055747 A1 20000921; AU 3355299 A 20001004; EP 1163600 A1 20011219; EP 1163600 A4 20040303; JP 2002539560 A 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160908

2016-09-08 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071218

2004-03-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE