Global Patent Index - EP 1163601 A1

EP 1163601 A1 2001-12-19 - DISTRIBUTION OF MUSICAL PRODUCTS OVER THE INTERNET

Title (en)

DISTRIBUTION OF MUSICAL PRODUCTS OVER THE INTERNET

Title (de)

VERTEILUNG VON MUSIKALISCHEN PRODUKTEN ÜBER DAS INTERNET

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS MUSICAUX PAR INTERNET

Publication

EP 1163601 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904551 A

Priority

  • US 0001832 W
  • US 11677899 P
  • US 11678099 P
  • US 11691099 P
  • US 11691799 P
  • US 11691899 P
  • US 11677999 P
  • US 48737200 A
  • US 48737300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0043904A1] The system and method permit the purchase of audio music files over the Internet. The PC user (18) logs onto the vendor's web site (20) and browses the songs available for purchase. The songs can be arranged by artist, music style, etc., as mentioned above. If interested in a song, the PC user (18) has the option of cliking on a song to "pre-listen" to it. If the PC user (18) then wishes to purchase the song, she can submit her order by cliking on the icons located next to each song/album. As the PC user selects more items, each and every item is displayed in the shopping basket (22). At any point in time, the PC user (18) can review her selections deleting items she no longer desires.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G10K 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0043904 A1 20000727; AU 2629000 A 20000807; CA 2360992 A1 20000727; EP 1163601 A1 20011219; EP 1163601 A4 20020508; JP 2003526805 A 20030909

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRITSCH, BERNHARD

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2002-05-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/00 A, 7G 06F 17/60 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI