Global Patent Index - EP 1163615 A1

EP 1163615 A1 2001-12-19 - AN ADVERTISEMENT SALES AND MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

AN ADVERTISEMENT SALES AND MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

EIN SYSTEM ZUM VERWALTEN UND VERKAUFEN VON WERBUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE VENTE ET DE GESTION DE PUBLICITE

Publication

EP 1163615 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00910563 A

Priority

  • DK 0000106 W
  • DK PA199900346 A
  • DK PA200000047 A
  • US 48246200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054192A1] An advertisement sales and management system is disclosed as well as a method that provides a comprehensive advertising solution which supports the integration of the total advertising workflow by handling all kinds of advertisements booked for multiple media including printed media as well as electronic media. Contents and/or presentation elements of an insertion of an advertisement may be reused in another insertion being in the same type of media or a different one. The system according to the present invention is capable of providing significant cost and time efficiencies in the entry, sales, production and management of advertisements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054192A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054192 A1 20000914; AU 3272500 A 20000928; EP 1163615 A1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070210

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCI EUROPE A/S (STIBO A/S)

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCI EUROPE A/S (AARHUUS STIFTSBOGTRYKKERIE, AKTIES

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCI EUROPE A/S (AARHUUS STIFTSBOGTRYKKERIE, AKTIES

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI