Global Patent Index - EP 1163657 A1

EP 1163657 A1 2001-12-19 - WEIGHTED MAPPING OF IMAGE DATA SAMPLES TO PIXEL SUB-COMPONENTS ON A DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

WEIGHTED MAPPING OF IMAGE DATA SAMPLES TO PIXEL SUB-COMPONENTS ON A DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

GEWICHTETE ZUORDNUNG VON BILDDATENPROBEN ZU BILDPUNKT-TEILKOMPONENTEN AUF EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROJECTION PONDEREE D'ECHANTILLONS DE DONNEES D'IMAGES SUR DES SOUS-COMPOSANTS DE PIXELS DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE

Publication

EP 1163657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99970200 A

Priority

  • US 9923469 W
  • US 16801298 A
  • US 24065499 A
  • US 41414499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0021070A1] Methods and apparatus for sampling image data (620) and mapping the samples (622, 623, 624) to pixel sub-components (632, 633, 634) which form a pixel element of an LCD display so that each pixel sub-component (632, 633, 634) has a different portion of the image (620) mapped thereto. The methods can be used with conventional color LCD displays that include pixels consisting of three non-overlapping red, green and blue rectangular pixel sub-elements or sub-components. The pixel sub-components (632, 633, 634) can be arranged on the display device to form horizontal or vertical stripes of individual colors. The separately-controllable nature of individual RGB pixel sub-components is used to effectively increase a screen's resolution in the dimension perpendicular to the dimension in which the screen is striped. A scan conversion process maps samples (622, 623, 624) of the image data (620) to individual pixel sub-components, resulting in each of the pixel sub-components representing a different portion of the image. The color values are independently generated for each of the red, green, and blue pixel sub-components based on different portions of the image (620), rather than the color values for the entire pixel being generated based on a single sample or the same portion of the image.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/13 (2006.01); G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/40 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01); G09G 5/02 (2006.01); G09G 5/24 (2006.01); G09G 5/28 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/28 (2013.01); G09G 3/20 (2013.01); G09G 5/24 (2013.01); G09G 3/2003 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0443 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0452 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0407 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0457 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0021070 A1 20000413; AT 511688 T 20110615; AT 543176 T 20120215; AU 1106900 A 20000426; AU 1443800 A 20000426; AU 6512199 A 20000426; CN 1322343 A 20011114; CN 1335976 A 20020213; EP 1155396 A1 20011121; EP 1155396 A4 20020213; EP 1155396 B1 20110601; EP 1163657 A1 20011219; EP 1163657 A4 20020213; EP 1163657 B1 20120125; JP 2002527776 A 20020827; JP 2003526803 A 20030909; JP 2012137775 A 20120719; JP 5231695 B2 20130710; JP 5231697 B2 20130710; WO 0021066 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171004

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171004

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC, US

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-07-15 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150706

2015-03-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC, REDMOND, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICROSOFT CORPORATION, REDMOND, WASH., US

- Document: DE 69944010

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-03-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC, REDMOND, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICROSOFT CORP., REDMOND, WASH., US

- Document: DE 69944010

- Effective date: 20120127

2015-03-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69944010

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-02-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150108 AND 20150114

2015-01-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69944010

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121007

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120506

2013-02-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69944010

- Effective date: 20121026

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2013-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121026

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-09-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-09-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 543176 T

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120426

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120525

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-05-09 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-03-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69944010

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-02-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2012-02-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 543176 T

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080205

2002-02-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020103

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09G 5/00 A, 7G 09G 5/28 B, 7G 09G 3/36 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI