Global Patent Index - EP 1163658 A4

EP 1163658 A4 2003-06-04 - COMPRESSION OF IMAGE DATA ASSOCIATED WITH TWO-DIMENSIONAL ARRAYS OF PIXEL SUB-COMPONENTS

Title (en)

COMPRESSION OF IMAGE DATA ASSOCIATED WITH TWO-DIMENSIONAL ARRAYS OF PIXEL SUB-COMPONENTS

Title (de)

KOMPRIMIERUNG VON BILDDATEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN ANORDNUNGEN VON BILDPUNKT-TEILKOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

COMPRESSION DE DONNEES D'IMAGES ASSOCIEES AUX RESEAUX BIDIMENSIONNELS DE SOUS-COMPOSANTS DE PIXELS

Publication

EP 1163658 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00907106 A

Priority

  • US 0002494 W
  • US 11804899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0045368A1] LCD Display device (320) with increased horizontal and vertical resolution. The horizontal resolution is increased by mapping spatially different sets of one or more samples to individual pixel sub-components (302, 304, 306). The vertical resolution is increased by increasing the number of pixel sub-component density in the vertical dimension. Image data compression is performed by controlling sets of vertically adjacent pixels (C1, R1) using red, green, and blue luminous intensity values and a bias value of the pixel sub-components (302, 304, 306, 312, 314, 316).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/10; G09G 3/20; G09G 3/36; G09G 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 3/40 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01); G09G 5/28 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01); H04N 1/46 (2006.01); H04N 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2003 (2013.01); G09G 3/20 (2013.01); G09G 3/3611 (2013.01); G09G 3/2074 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0443 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0452 (2013.01); G09G 2320/02 (2013.01); G09G 2340/02 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0414 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0428 (2013.01); G09G 2340/0457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0045368 A1 20000803; AT 293273 T 20050415; AT 507553 T 20110515; AU 2866100 A 20000818; DE 60019403 D1 20050519; DE 60019403 T2 20050908; DE 60045899 D1 20110609; EP 1163658 A1 20011219; EP 1163658 A4 20030604; EP 1163658 B1 20050413; EP 1557813 A2 20050727; EP 1557813 A3 20090722; EP 1557813 B1 20110427; ES 2361415 T3 20110616; JP 2002536678 A 20021029; JP 4833412 B2 20111207

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC, US

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-03-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC, REDMOND, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICROSOFT CORP., REDMOND, WASH., US

- Document: DE 60019403

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-03-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60019403

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-02-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150108 AND 20150114

2015-01-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60019403

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2006-11-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-07-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019403 P 20050519

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09G 5/10 A, 7G 09G 3/20 B, 7G 09G 3/36 B, 7G 09G 5/24 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI