Global Patent Index - EP 1163660 A2

EP 1163660 A2 2001-12-19 - METHOD WITH A PLURALITY OF SPEECH RECOGNIZERS

Title (en)

METHOD WITH A PLURALITY OF SPEECH RECOGNIZERS

Title (de)

MEHRERE SPRACHERKENNER VERWENDENDES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE AVEC PLUSIEURS RECONNAISSEURS VOCAUX

Publication

EP 1163660 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00905058 A

Priority

  • DE 19910234 A
  • EP 0001145 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910234A1] The invention relates to a method in which an information unit (3) that makes a speech input possible is stored on a server (1) and can be retrieved by a client (2) and the client (2) can be coupled through the communications network (6) to a plurality of speech recognizers (7-9) and a speech input given by a user is applied to at least one speech recognizer (7-9) for generating at least one recognition result (11-13) and the recognition result (11-13) is interpreted in a plurality of independent processes and a plurality of interpretation results (22-24) are generated which are sent to a user. The user then receives in a brief period of time a plurality of qualified information items for which otherwise he would several times have had to make an inquiry in databases by means of a speech input.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 11/00; G10L 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G10L 15/32 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054252A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910234 A1 20000921; AU 2672100 A 20000928; CN 1350685 A 20020522; EP 1163660 A2 20011219; JP 2002539481 A 20021119; WO 0054252 A2 20000914; WO 0054252 A3 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 11/00 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 15/28 B

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCANSOFT, INC.

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/00 A, 7G 10L 15/28 B

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI