Global Patent Index - EP 1163661 A2

EP 1163661 A2 2001-12-19 - METHOD OF SPEECH RECOGNITION

Title (en)

METHOD OF SPEECH RECOGNITION

Title (de)

SPRACHERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE

Publication

EP 1163661 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00909156 A

Priority

  • DE 19910236 A
  • EP 0001143 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910236A1] In a method in which an information unit (4) enabling a speech input is stored on a server (5) and can be retrieved by a client (1, 2, 3) and in which the client can be coupled to one or more speech recognizers (7, 8, 9) through a communications network (6), the information unit (4) is assigned additional information (12) which is provided for determining a combination of a client (1, 2, 3) for recognizing an uttered speech signal and at least one of the speech recognizers (7, 8, 9), to dynamically assign the speech recognizers (7, 8, 9) in a communications network (6) to the information units (4) and thus ensure an acceptable processing time for the recognition of a speech input with a high recognition quality.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G10L 15/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/26 (2006.01); G10L 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054251A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910236 A1 20000921; AT 257616 T 20040115; AU 3153700 A 20000928; CN 1343351 A 20020403; EP 1163661 A2 20011219; EP 1163661 B1 20040107; JP 2002539480 A 20021119; JP 4597383 B2 20101215; US 6757655 B1 20040629; WO 0054251 A2 20000914; WO 0054251 A3 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PHILIPS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 20099 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 60007620

2015-07-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PHILIPS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 20099 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 60007620

2015-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60007620

- Representative's name: MEYER, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-01-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-07-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60007620

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G10L0011000000

- IPC: G10L0025000000

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY &, , NL

- Document: DE 60007620

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY &, , NL

- Document: DE 60007620

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY &, , NL

- Document: DE 60007620

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH, 20099 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 60007620

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH, 20099 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 60007620

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60007620

- Representative's name: MEYER, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-05-27 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60007620

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G10L0011000000

- IPC: G10L0025000000

2014-03-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60007620

- Representative's name: MEYER, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-11-19 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-04-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040418

2004-04-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007620 P 20040212

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-02-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-04 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 11/00 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 15/26 B

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 11/00 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 15/26 B

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/00 A, 7G 10L 15/26 B

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE