Global Patent Index - EP 1163682 A1

EP 1163682 A1 2001-12-19 - RADIATING CABLE

Title (en)

RADIATING CABLE

Title (de)

STRAHLENDES KABEL

Title (fr)

CABLE RAYONNANT

Publication

EP 1163682 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00910958 A

Priority

  • FR 0000634 W
  • FR 9903586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2791475A1] The invention concerns a radiating cable comprising at least a cable section (1) including a pair of insulated conductor wires (2) having first ends (3) connected to a load (4) equal to a characteristic impedance of the insulated conductor wires and second ends (5) connected to a connector (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/08; H01Q 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/02 (2006.01); H01Q 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/20 (2013.01); H01Q 13/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057431A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2791475 A1 20000929; FR 2791475 B1 20070223; AU 3298700 A 20001009; DE 60032587 D1 20070208; DE 60032587 T2 20071004; EP 1163682 A1 20011219; EP 1163682 B1 20061227; ES 2277830 T3 20070801; JP 2002540662 A 20021126; US 6781051 B1 20040824; WO 0057431 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60032587

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60032587

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100316

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2277830 T3

2007-03-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032587 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SILEC CABLE

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATION

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE