Global Patent Index - EP 1163686 A1

EP 1163686 A1 2001-12-19 - ELECTROMAGNET

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNET

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNET

Title (fr)

ELECTRO-AIMANT

Publication

EP 1163686 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01909656 A

Priority

  • DE 10002295 A
  • DE 10039869 A
  • EP 0100569 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154147A1] The invention relates to an electromagnet which is provided with a yoke consisting of lamella and having an electric turn and an armature engaging therewith. The yoke is provided with deflection resistant yoke side plates at least on the outer sides of the lamella packet. Said side plates are welded to at least a part of the lamella.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/08; F01L 9/04; H01F 3/02; H01F 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 3/02 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 3/02 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01); H01F 7/14 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0154147A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154147 A1 20010726; EP 1163686 A1 20011219; EP 1163686 B1 20040728

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50102969

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: THOMAS LEIBER, DE

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HEINZ LEIBER, DE

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, 71739 OBERRIEXINGEN, DE; LEIBER, THOMAS, 80796 MUENCHEN, DE; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50102969

2015-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEIBER, THOMAS, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, 71739 OBERRIEXINGEN, DE; LEIBER, THOMAS, 80796 MUENCHEN, DE; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50102969

2015-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LEIBER, HEINZ, DIPL-ING, 71739 OBERRIEXINGEN, DE; LEIBER, THOMAS, 80796 MUENCHEN, DE; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50102969

2015-07-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50102969

- Representative's name: LENZING GERBER STUTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAF, DE

2015-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102969 P 20040902

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR