Global Patent Index - EP 1163687 A1

EP 1163687 A1 2001-12-19 - ELECTROMAGNET

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNET

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNET

Title (fr)

ELECTROAIMANT

Publication

EP 1163687 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01942784 A

Priority

  • DE 10002628 A
  • EP 0100565 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154146A1] Disclosed is an electromagnet. The yoke of said electromagnet is comprised of lamellae. The stack of lamellae is arranged between two bearing plates. The end plates are connected by means of two yoke side plates. The armature is mounted inside the bearing plates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/08; F01L 9/04; H01F 3/02; H01F 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 3/02 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/14 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 3/02 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0154146A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154146 A1 20010726; DE 10002628 A1 20010726; EP 1163687 A1 20011219; EP 1163687 B1 20040901

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103445 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR