Global Patent Index - EP 1163703 A1

EP 1163703 A1 2001-12-19 - METAL VANADIUM OXIDE PARTICLES

Title (en)

METAL VANADIUM OXIDE PARTICLES

Title (de)

METALLTEILCHEN MIT VANADIUMOXID

Title (fr)

PARTICULES METALLIQUES A L'OXYDE DE VANADIUM

Publication

EP 1163703 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00905921 A

Priority

  • US 0002653 W
  • US 24607699 A
  • US 31150699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0046867A1] Metal vanadium oxide particles have been produced with an average diameter less than about 500 nm. The metal vanadium oxide particles have very uniform properties. In some embodiments, silver vanadium oxide particles are formed by the heat treatment of a mixture of nanoscale vanadium oxide and a silver compound. Other metal vanadium oxide particles can be produced by similar processes. In other embodiments, laser pyrolysis is used to produce directly metal vanadium oxide composite nanoparticles. To perform the pyrolysis a reactant stream is formed including a vanadium precursor and a second metal precursor. The pyrolysis is driven by energy absorbed from a light beam. Metal vanadium oxide nanoparticles can be incorporated into a cathode of a lithium based battery to obtain increased energy densities. Implantable defibrillators can be constructed with lithium based batteries having increased energy densities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 4/58; C01F 1/00; C01G 31/00; C01G 31/02; H01B 1/02; H01M 4/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01F 1/00 (2006.01); C01G 31/00 (2006.01); C01G 31/02 (2006.01); H01B 1/02 (2006.01); H01B 1/08 (2006.01); H01M 4/131 (2010.01); H01M 4/34 (2006.01); H01M 4/48 (2010.01); H01M 4/485 (2010.01); H01M 6/16 (2006.01); H01M 10/32 (2006.01); H01M 4/02 (2006.01); H01M 4/54 (2006.01); H01M 4/58 (2010.01); H01M 10/052 (2010.01); H01M 10/36 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/131 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C01G 31/00 (2013.01); C01G 31/02 (2013.01); H01M 4/485 (2013.01); C01P 2002/72 (2013.01); C01P 2002/88 (2013.01); C01P 2004/03 (2013.01); C01P 2004/04 (2013.01); C01P 2004/62 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01); C01P 2006/40 (2013.01); H01M 4/54 (2013.01); H01M 4/5825 (2013.01); H01M 10/052 (2013.01); H01M 2004/021 (2013.01); H01M 2004/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0046867 A1 20000810; CN 1343378 A 20020403; EP 1163703 A1 20011219; EP 1163703 A4 20041229; JP 2002536286 A 20021029; KR 20020018997 A 20020309

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060515

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050125

2004-12-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01M 4/58 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01M 4/34 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01F 1/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01B 1/02 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01G 31/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01G 31/02 B

2004-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILSON GREATBATCH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOPHOTONICS CORPORATION

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HORNE, CRAIG, R.

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REITZ, HARIKLIA, DRIS

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCKLEY, JAMES, P.

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUMAR, SUJEET

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FORTUNAK, YU, K.

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BI, XIANGXIN

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE