Global Patent Index - EP 1163719 A1

EP 1163719 A1 2001-12-19 - RADIO FM RECEIVER

Title (en)

RADIO FM RECEIVER

Title (de)

FM RUNDFUNKEMPFÄNGER

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR RADIO FM

Publication

EP 1163719 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00993802 A

Priority

  • EP 00993802 A
  • EP 0013199 W
  • EP 00200207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154267A1] A radio FM receiver is provided with a voltage-controlled oscillator which can be connected via a frequency 2-divider to a quadrature combination circuit for transforming down the frequencies of received radio signals and for supplying quadrature output signals. The receiver is further provided with detection and sound reproduction means connected to this combination circuit. A frequency 3-divider is also present, by means of which the oscillator can be connected to the combination circuit, as well as switching means for connecting the mixer element to the oscillator either through the 2-divider or through the 3-divider.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 21/00 (2006.01); H03D 3/00 (2006.01); H03D 7/18 (2006.01); H04B 1/10 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03D 3/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0154267A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154267 A1 20010726; CN 1230980 C 20051207; CN 1344435 A 20020410; DE 60026179 D1 20060427; DE 60026179 T2 20061102; EP 1163719 A1 20011219; EP 1163719 B1 20060222; JP 2003520546 A 20030702; JP 4724794 B2 20110713; KR 100690954 B1 20070309; US 2002065057 A1 20020530; US 6788922 B2 20040907

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCT CIRCUIT TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60026179

2017-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60026179

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2007-01-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60026179 P 20060427

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR