Global Patent Index - EP 1163781 A1

EP 1163781 A1 2001-12-19 - Use of a mobile telecommunications terminal

Title (en)

Use of a mobile telecommunications terminal

Title (de)

Verwendung eines mobilen telekommunikations-endgeräts

Title (fr)

L'utilisation d'un terminal de telecommunication mobile

Publication

EP 1163781 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00922451 A

Priority

  • DE 0000877 W
  • DE 19913884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913884A1] The invention relates to a mobile telecommunications terminal which can be used with different base stations (a, b, c, d). In a number memory (3) of the terminal an information (column 10) assigned to a particular call number (8) which indicates in connection with which of the base stations said call number can be dialed is stored. Among the names allocated to the call numbers display means show only those which can be dialed in connection with a particular base station. This base station can be selected manually or automatically by way of a data exchange with the base station concerned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/274; H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/247 (2006.01); H04M 1/274 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/56 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01); H04M 1/733 (2006.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01); H04Q 7/32 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/2745 (2013.01); H04M 1/72502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0059183A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913884 A1 20001005; DE 19913884 C2 20020307; EP 1163781 A1 20011219; JP 2002540732 A 20021126; US 6904299 B1 20050607; WO 0059183 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101116

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04M 1/274 20060101AFI20100621BHEP

2010-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL

2009-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIGASET COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE