Global Patent Index - EP 1163804 A1

EP 1163804 A1 2001-12-19 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMON INTELLIGENT NETWORK INTERCONNECTION

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMON INTELLIGENT NETWORK INTERCONNECTION

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES GEMEINSAMEN INTELLIGENTEN NETZWERKES

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'INTERCONNEXION INTELLIGENTE COMMUNE POUR RESEAUX

Publication

EP 1163804 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00918334 A

Priority

  • US 0007811 W
  • US 27635299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057652A1] A system and method for providing a common intelligent network interconnection for transparently linking disparate networks using an emulation of customer equipment interfaces and alternate transport mechanisms, such as Voice over Internet Protocol or other, packet-based transports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 3/00; H04M 3/42; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 7/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/0029 (2013.01); H04M 3/4228 (2013.01); H04M 7/006 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5618 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5619 (2013.01); H04L 2012/563 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057652A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057652 A1 20000928; AU 3916300 A 20001009; EP 1163804 A1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160715

2016-03-30 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHELBY, BETTIE

2016-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KACZALA, JOHN

2016-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOWMAN, CODY

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04M 7/00 20060101ALI20160127BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04Q 3/00 20060101AFI20160127BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 12/70 20130101ALN20160127BHEP

2016-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04M 3/42 20060101ALI20160127BHEP

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070809

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERICSSON INC.

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KACZALA, JOHN

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOWMAN, CODY

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHELBY, BETTIE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI