Global Patent Index - EP 1163806 A1

EP 1163806 A1 2001-12-19 - METHOD AND NETWORK FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION BETWEEN A SWITCHING CENTRE AND A COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND NETWORK FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION BETWEEN A SWITCHING CENTRE AND A COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND NETZ ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ZWISCHEN EINER VERMITTLUNGSSTELLE UND EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET RESEAU PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE DES INFORMATIONS ENTRE UNE CENTRALE ET UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1163806 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929251 A

Priority

  • DE 0000931 W
  • DE 19914795 A
  • DE 10010495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060879A1] The invention relates to a method and a telecommunications network (NET) for transmitting data to an operator (OP1) of an operator service (OPS). After the user (OP1) has been logged onto a remote master exchange (VS2), the co-ordination processor (COP) thereof sends a request to a virtual operator (VOP) to initiate a selection procedure for the operator (OP1). A connection to the operator is established via a call channel. The data to be transmitted is loaded from the co-ordination processor (CP2) into a group processor (GRP) in the master exchange. A data transmission link (RIN) to a peripheral terminal group (LTC) is created in the master exchange (VS2) for quick data transmission. The data to be transmitted is sent to the switching centre (VS1) of the operator (OP1) via a data link and is then sent to the operator (OP1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 3/00; H04M 3/51; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/51 (2006.01); H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/5125 (2013.01); H04Q 3/0016 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0457 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1302 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1304 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13072 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13095 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13106 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13109 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13174 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13176 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13209 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1337 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13389 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0060879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060879 A1 20001012; CN 1353910 A 20020612; EP 1163806 A1 20011219; US 6876740 B1 20050405

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060209

2005-11-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND NETWORK FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION BETWEEN A SWITCHING CENTRE AND A COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE