Global Patent Index - EP 1163863 A1

EP 1163863 A1 2001-12-19 - Rotary shelf mechanism for a corner cupboard

Title (en)

Rotary shelf mechanism for a corner cupboard

Title (de)

Karussellvorrichtung für einen Eckschrank

Title (fr)

Placard de coin avec tambour tournant

Publication

EP 1163863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111728 A

Priority

DE 20010807 U

Abstract (en)

The carousel device is for a kitchen corner cabinet and has a holding column (7) rotatable around a vertical rotary axis (8) for retention of at least one compartment base (4), which has a cut-out (18), so that it can be fitted from the side to the holding column. A door (5,6), particularly twin-paneled, is fitted to a cabinet aperture running over the corner. The door is movable between an outer closed position and an open position facing the holding column, inserting in the compartment base cut-out in theeopen position. The holding column is eccentric in relation to the rotary axis and is thereby displaced in relation to the door side of the carousel device.

Abstract (de)

Eine Karussellvorrichtung für einen Eckschrank weist eine um eine in Einbaulage vertikale Drehachse drehbare Haltesäule (7) zum Halten mindestens eines Fachbodens (4) auf, der einen Ausschnitt (18) aufweist, so dass er von der Seite her an die Haltesäule (7) ansetzbar ist. Die Karussellvorrichtung enthält ferner eine, insbesondere zweiflügelige, Türe (5,6), die einer über Eck verlaufenden Schranköffnung (14) zugeordnet und zwischen einer äußeren Schließstellung und einer inneren, der Haltesäule (7) zugewandten Offenstellung bewegbar ist und in der Offenstellung in den Fachbodenausschnitt (18) eintaucht. Die Haltesäule (7) ist mit Bezug auf die Drehachse (8) exzentrisch und dabei zur Türseite der Karussellvorrichtung (3) hin versetzt angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0317737 A2 19890531 - HETTICH HETAL WERKE [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010807 U1 20000824; AT 270511 T 20040715; EP 1163863 A1 20011219; EP 1163863 B1 20040707

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50102782

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090515

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102782 P 20040812

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-07-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020412

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI