Global Patent Index - EP 1163867 A2

EP 1163867 A2 2001-12-19 - Mattress support

Title (en)

Mattress support

Title (de)

Matratzenauflagerung

Title (fr)

Support de matelas

Publication

EP 1163867 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113950 A

Priority

DE 20010400 U

Abstract (en)

A variable posture bed frame has the back and neck supports (18, 19) jointed (16, 17) to adjust the optimum contour. A shaped cam lever (7) has a rotating mounting on an extension of the back support. The lower arm of the cam has a curved profile (13) resting on a bearing (9) on the bed frame and raises and lowers the back support. The upper arm (15) has a cam profile that raises and lowers the neck support. The adjusting cam can be servo driven or is manually adjusted. The sections of the bed frame comprise side struts linked by transverse laths.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Matratzenauflagerung, insbesondere ein Bettlattenrost mit einer gegenüber einem verstellbaren Rückenteil (18) anhebbaren Nackenstütze (19) zur Verfügung gestellt, deren Verstellmechanismus leicht und wirtschaftlich herstellbar ist und der eine direkte Abstützung am Rückenteil (18) gewährleistet, was dadurch erreicht wird, dass der Verstellmechanismus einen Verstellhebel (7) aufweist, der an einem dem Gelenk (16) des Rückenteils (18) abgewandten Seite an diesem auf einer Drehachse (10) verschwenkbar gelagert ist und der einen in einer am Längs- oder Querholm (2) festgelegten Zwangsführung (8) geführten Führungsbogen (13) sowie einen Hebelarm (15) aufweist, der sich an einem dem Gelenk (17) der Nackenstütze (19) abgewandten Bereich an dieser abstützt, sodass bei einem Anheben des Rückenteils (18) der Verstellhebel (7) von der Zwangsführung (8) des Führungsbogens (13) um die Drehachse (10) verschwenkbar und die Nackenstütze (19) von dem Hebelarm (15) mit dem Rückenteil (18) miteilend, anhebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/08; A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 20/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/04 (2013.01); A47C 20/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010400 U1 20000928; AU 3513401 A 20011220; DE 50111438 D1 20061228; EP 1163867 A2 20011219; EP 1163867 A3 20041103; EP 1163867 B1 20061115; US 2002002743 A1 20020110; US 6463607 B2 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111438

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110503

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111438 P 20061228

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-07-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-06-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 20/08 A

2004-11-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 20/04 B

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI