Global Patent Index - EP 1163924 A2

EP 1163924 A2 2001-12-19 - A nasal mask

Title (en)

A nasal mask

Title (de)

Nasenmaske

Title (fr)

Masque nasal

Publication

EP 1163924 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01114354 A

Priority

  • NZ 50515400 A
  • NZ 50515500 A
  • NZ 50515600 A
  • NZ 50821800 A
  • NZ 50821900 A
  • NZ 50843300 A
  • NZ 50903900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1163923A2] A CPAP system is described for improved respiratory therapy of patients. In particular a patient interface is disclosed with an outlet vent with lower noise levels and more diffused outlet flow over prior art outlet vents. The outlet vent includes a main vent which is diffused and muffled and a higher resistance vent provided in case the main vent is blocked. The outlet vent is removable for easy maintenance and provides indication to the user when maintenance is required. The outlet vent described may be used on nasal masks, mouthpieces and patient interfaces generally. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 16/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/00 (2006.01); A61M 16/06 (2006.01); A61M 16/08 (2006.01); A62B 18/02 (2006.01); A62B 18/08 (2006.01); A61M 16/10 (2006.01); A61M 16/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/0683 (2013.01); A61M 16/0069 (2013.01); A61M 16/06 (2013.01); A61M 16/0616 (2013.01); A61M 16/0638 (2013.01); A61M 16/0666 (2013.01); A61M 16/08 (2013.01); A61M 16/1065 (2013.01); A61M 16/109 (2013.01); A61M 16/1095 (2013.01); A61M 16/0066 (2013.01); A61M 16/1045 (2013.01); A61M 16/16 (2013.01); A61M 2016/0039 (2013.01); A61M 2205/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1163923 A2 20011219; EP 1163923 A3 20020731; EP 1163923 B1 20051116; AT 309835 T 20051215; AU 5187601 A 20011220; AU 5187701 A 20011220; AU 783749 B2 20051201; AU 784321 B2 20060309; CA 2350351 A1 20011214; CA 2350351 C 20081125; CA 2350356 A1 20011214; CA 2350356 C 20090908; DE 60114929 D1 20051222; DE 60114929 T2 20060629; DE 60132734 D1 20080327; DE 60132734 T2 20090305; EP 1163924 A2 20011219; EP 1163924 A3 20020619; EP 1163924 B1 20080213; EP 1905475 A2 20080402; EP 1905475 A3 20080416; EP 1905475 B1 20171101; ES 2178980 T1 20030116; ES 2178980 T3 20080616; ES 2250263 T3 20060416; ES 2657501 T3 20180305; JP 2002028240 A 20020129; JP 2002095751 A 20020402; JP 4639003 B2 20110223; US 2002005201 A1 20020117; US 2002014241 A1 20020207; US 2004065327 A1 20040408; US 6615834 B2 20030909; US 6662803 B2 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170705

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081114

2008-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178980 T3

2008-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60132734 P 20080327

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-02-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LIMITED

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRADON, LEWIS GEORGE

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMITH, NICHOLAS CHARLES ALAN

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCAULEY, ALASTAIR EDWIN

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAYCOCK, MARK JOSEPH

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NIGHTINGALE, CHRIS EARL

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI