Global Patent Index - EP 1163931 A2

EP 1163931 A2 2001-12-19 - System for automatic self-proportioning of foam concentrate into fire fighting fluid variable flow conduit

Title (en)

System for automatic self-proportioning of foam concentrate into fire fighting fluid variable flow conduit

Title (de)

System zum selbsttätigen Dosieren von Schaumkonzentrat in einem Rohr mit variabler Durchflussrate für Brandbekämpfungsflüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Système pour le dosage automatique de concentré de mousse dans un tube avec taux de débit variable pour fluide pour la lutte contre les incendies

Publication

EP 1163931 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01305196 A

Priority

US 59336000 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for and a method of proportioning foam concentrate (FC) into a variable flow fire fighting fluid conduit (C) in which a first variable orifice (VWO) in the conduit (C) is arranged to maintain a predetermined pressure drop in the conduit less than a discharge pressure drop from the apparatus; a second variable orifice (VMO) in a foam concentrate conduit or inlet (FC1) is arranged to vary in concert with the first orifice such that the foam concentrate (FC) is proportioned into the fire fighting fluid (W). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1163931 A2 20011219; EP 1163931 A3 20020612

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090804

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050128

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI