Global Patent Index - EP 1163937 A2

EP 1163937 A2 2001-12-19 - Elevating-plate

Title (en)

Elevating-plate

Title (de)

Erhöhungsplatte

Title (fr)

Plaque de surélévation

Publication

EP 1163937 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01110944 A

Priority

  • DE 10028211 A
  • DE 10036236 A

Abstract (en)

The raised plate (1) is in at least two parts (1',1) forming an opening (9) between them for fastenings or holders holding the binding and fitting into the snowboard (2). The two plate parts are adjustable in relation to each other for setting the active width of the plate at right angles to a middle plane intersecting an upper and lower side of the plate. On one side (4) of the plate the two plate parts form at least one wing (6) resting against the snowboard.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine neuartige Erhöhungsplatte für die Bindung oder ein Bindungselement eines Gleitbrettes, beispielsweise Schneegleitbrettes, insbesondere Gleitbrettes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1163937 A2 20011219; EP 1163937 A3 20021023; US 2002005626 A1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-08-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63C 9/00 A, 7A 63C 9/08 B

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI