Global Patent Index - EP 1163960 A1

EP 1163960 A1 2001-12-19 - Washing device for small-sized pieces

Title (en)

Washing device for small-sized pieces

Title (de)

Waschvorrichtung für kleine Teile

Title (fr)

Dispositif de lavage pour pièces de petit volume

Publication

EP 1163960 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00201930 A

Priority

EP 00201930 A

Abstract (en)

Small timepiece components such as balance springs (1) are held securely in profiled grooves (18,19) on a circular rotating plate (7) such that their larger parallel faces (2,3) are orientated radially and perpendicularly to the plate. A number of the plates (9,10,11,12) are stacked together, separated by spacers (13) and rotated about a shaft (8) within a container (5) containing washing liquid : Independent claims are made for the methods used in the washing machine design.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 11/02; B08B 3/10; G04D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/10 (2006.01); B08B 11/02 (2006.01); G04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 11/02 (2013.01); B08B 3/10 (2013.01); G04D 3/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1163960 A1 20011219; EP 1163960 B1 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1163960E

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2002-11-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2002-11-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK FR LI

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR LI

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI