Global Patent Index - EP 1163961 A1

EP 1163961 A1 2001-12-19 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing a gearing element

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for manufacturing a gearing element

Title (de)

Verfahren und Drückvorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Getriebeteiles

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'un élement de transmission

Publication

EP 1163961 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01102425 A

Priority

DE 10029005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10029005A1] The part is formed from a round blank, which is clamped in a tool and reduced in thickness by a pressure roller moving in a radial direction. The blank is clamped by pressing an edge section axially against the tool and simultaneous radial expansion of the blank against a ring-shaped axially projecting part of the tool. The blank is held non-positively and/or positively on the tool, by esp. a magnetic or vacuum clamping device until the clamping force is generated.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Drückvorrichtung (10) zur Herstellung eines Getriebeteiles (12) mit Nabe (14) aus einer Ronde (16). Die Ronde (16) wird an einem Werkzeug (18) einer rotierend antreibbaren Spindel der Drückvorrichtung (10) angeordnet und eingespannt. Mittels mindestens einer Drückrolle (40) wird die Dicke der Ronde (16) verringert und das dabei anfallende Material zu der Nabe (14) geformt. Zur Vereinfachung der Einspannung ist es vorgesehen, dass das Einspannen der Ronde (16) durch axiales Andrücken eines Randbereiches der Ronde gegen das Werkzeug (18) und gleichzeitiges radiales Erweitern der Ronde (16) durchgeführt wird, wobei beim radialen Erweitern der Ronde diese gegen eine ringförmige, in Umfangsrichtung verlaufende Wand (24) an dem Werkzeug (18) geformt wird. Die Ronde (16) wird dabei kraft- und/oder formschlüssig an dem Werkzeug (18) gehaltert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/16; B21D 53/26; B21D 53/28; B21H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/14 (2006.01); B21D 53/26 (2006.01); B21D 53/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/28 (2013.01); B21D 22/14 (2013.01); B21D 53/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10029005 A1 20010118; AT 218403 T 20020615; EP 1163961 A1 20011219; EP 1163961 B1 20020605; EP 1163961 B2 20100303

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100005

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-03-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LEIFELD METAL SPINNING GMBH

2003-04-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WF-MASCHINENBAU UND BLECHFORMTECHNIK GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1163961E

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100005 20020711

2002-07-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218403 T 20020615

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI