Global Patent Index - EP 1163979 A1

EP 1163979 A1 2001-12-19 - Pneumatically operated precision pliers

Title (en)

Pneumatically operated precision pliers

Title (de)

Pneumatische Präzisions-Zange

Title (fr)

Pince de précision pneumatique

Publication

EP 1163979 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112559 A

Priority

EP 00112559 A

Abstract (en)

The implement, especially pneumatic tongs (1) has a cylinder (3) with one or more pneumatically operated pistons in a row. Each piston rod (6) in the cylinder cover (13) is sealed and guided by means of a seal (24) against the previous piston (5). Components (34,35) cooperate with the piston(s) for operating the implement. The pistons are supported by at least one piston-guide-belt towards the cylinder's inner wall.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum pneumatischen Betätigen eines mittels Druck antreibbaren Werkzeuges, wie insbesondere eine pneumatische Zange (1) weist einen Zylinder (3) mit einem oder mehreren in Reihe angeordneten pneumatisch betreibbaren, kraftschlüssigen Kolben (5) auf zur Erzeugung einer translatorischen Kraft. Die jeweiligen Kolbenstangen (6) der Kolben (5) sind in Zylinderdeckeln (13) mittels einer Abdichtung (24), wie beispielsweise einer Lippendichtung, gegen den vorherigen Kolben (5, 34) abgedichtet und geführt. Mit den Kolben wirkverbunden sind Komponenten, wie ein Keilkolben (34), gekoppelt mit einem keilförmigen Keil (35) für die Uebertragung der translatorischen Kraft und für die Betätigung des Werkzeuges. Die Kolben (5, 34) sind mittels mindestens eines Kolbenführungsbandes (23) gegen die Zylinderinnenwandung gerichtet abgestützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/12; F15B 11/036; F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/12 (2006.01); B25B 27/14 (2006.01); F15B 11/036 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/146 (2013.01); B25B 7/126 (2013.01); F15B 11/0365 (2013.01); F15B 15/1442 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/41527 (2013.01); F15B 2211/455 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7055 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5377 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5383 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1163979 A1 20011219; EP 1163979 B1 20061115; AT 345196 T 20061215; AU 2001256042 B2 20050818; AU 2001256042 B9 20060112; AU 5604201 A 20011224; BR 0111386 A 20030520; BR 0111386 B1 20100629; CA 2412234 A1 20021211; CA 2412234 C 20091110; CN 1264650 C 20060719; CN 1436114 A 20030813; CZ 20024033 A3 20040714; CZ 298243 B6 20070801; DE 50013754 D1 20061228; DK 1163979 T3 20070305; ES 2275461 T3 20070616; HK 1057022 A1 20070309; HU 0302673 A2 20031128; HU 227784 B1 20120228; JP 2004503390 A 20040205; JP 4918208 B2 20120418; KR 100658471 B1 20061218; KR 20030014714 A 20030219; MX PA02011998 A 20040226; NO 20026031 A 20021216; NO 20026031 D0 20021216; NO 323267 B1 20070219; PT 1163979 E 20070131; US 2004010899 A1 20040122; US 7107814 B2 20060919; WO 0196071 A1 20011220; WO 0196071 A8 20030103; ZA 200209014 B 20030822

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170704

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160614

2017-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 345196 T

- Effective date: 20160614

2017-02-08 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-01-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070400406

- Effective date: 20160112

2016-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160112

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150614

2016-03-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150614

2016-02-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150614

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150614

2016-01-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-10-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150828

2015-10-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: OETIKER SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Effective date: 20150828

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150609

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-14 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: OETIKER SCHWEIZ AG

- Effective date: 20150810

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150610

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-08 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150703

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OETIKER SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS OETIKER AG MASCHINEN- UND APPARATEFABRIK, HORGEN, CH

- Document: DE 50013754

- Effective date: 20150513

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013754

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE STREHL, SCHUEBEL-HOPF & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20150513

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013754

- Representative's name: STREHL SCHUEBEL-HOPF & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150513

2015-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OETIKER SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS OETIKER AG MASCHINEN- UND APPARATEFABRIK, CH

2015-05-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013754

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE STREHL, SCHUEBEL-HOPF & PARTNER, DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2275461 T3

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-26 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070400406

2007-03-05 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2007-02-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070130

2007-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061229

2006-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013754 P 20061228

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040204

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011208

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI