Global Patent Index - EP 1163980 A2

EP 1163980 A2 2001-12-19 - Hand tool

Title (en)

Hand tool

Title (de)

Handwerkzeuggerät

Title (fr)

Outil portatif

Publication

EP 1163980 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01810548 A

Priority

DE 10029728 A

Abstract (en)

A coupling slide-piece (4) is at right angles to a tool-spindle (3) and is fixed to a conical pinion (10) fitting into a spindle pinion (9) belonging to the tool spindle. The coupling slide piece is connected to at least one engaging cam (6) and is axially movably joined to gear pinions (11). In a third method of operation, the spindle is locked in relation to a housing (5), with the engaging cam engaging with cavities (7) on the housing side.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Handwerkzeuggerät mit zumindest zwei schaltbaren Betriebsmodi (2) ist in einem weiteren, über den Kupplungsschieber (4) schaltbaren, dritten Betriebsmode (2b) die Werkzeugspindel (3) drehfest bezüglich eines Gehäuses (5) arretiert, indem in dieser Schaltposition die Eingriffsnocke (6) mit gehäuseseitigen Ausnehmungen (7) im Eingriff steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/006 (2013.01); B25D 2211/003 (2013.01); B25D 2211/068 (2013.01); B25D 2216/0046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1163980 A2 20011219; EP 1163980 A3 20031022; EP 1163980 B1 20051123; CN 1186172 C 20050126; CN 1329973 A 20020109; DE 10029728 A1 20011220; DE 50108137 D1 20051229; JP 2002028878 A 20020129; JP 4920833 B2 20120418; US 2001052417 A1 20011220; US 6478095 B2 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108137

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130607

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130607

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130608

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120606

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120619

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060109

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108137 P 20051229

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI