Global Patent Index - EP 1164014 A1

EP 1164014 A1 2001-12-19 - Liquid jet device and liquid jet driving method

Title (en)

Liquid jet device and liquid jet driving method

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsstrahlgerät und Flüssigkeitsstrahl-Ansteuermethode

Title (fr)

Appareil de jets de liquide et procédé de commandement pour jets de liquide

Publication

EP 1164014 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00112694 A

Priority

EP 00112694 A

Abstract (en)

At a dot cycle (T3), a dummy burst signal as well as a jet burst signal (26) are supplied to a vibration exciter (9a) to drive it so that the vibration exciter (9a) can provide liquid (30) with a periodic radiation pressure. The dummy burst signal is so determined as to jet no droplet (31) with a smaller number of pulses and so on. That allows a stable motion of the meniscus of ink (30), and it is thereby possible to stably jet the droplets (31). With this control provided is a technique to improve a shape of an ink surface from which the droplets (31) are created and stably jet the droplets (31) when a liquid jet unit (3) for jetting the droplets (31) from a liquid surface (93) is driven. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164014 A1 20011219; EP 1164014 B1 20031105; DE 60006366 D1 20031211; DE 60006366 T2 20040826

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150615

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150615

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60006366

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-01 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60006366

- Effective date: 20110506

2011-07-14 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60006366

2011-06-08 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20110513

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60006366 P 20031211

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI