Global Patent Index - EP 1164017 A1

EP 1164017 A1 2001-12-19 - Ink jet recording head and method for manufacturing ink jet recording head

Title (en)

Ink jet recording head and method for manufacturing ink jet recording head

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopfes

Title (fr)

Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et procédé de fabrication d'une tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1164017 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01114341 A

Priority

JP 2000180344 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording head comprises a substrate having the element surface provided with energy generating elements for generating energy to be used for discharging ink, a ceiling plate provided with the grooved surface having grooves to become ink passage corresponding to the energy generating elements, the grooved surface and the element surface being bonded to form the ink passage, a base plate for supporting the substrate from the side opposite to the element surface, and an ink supply member being in contact with the base plate at a contact portion, having the ink flow path wall face to be communicated with the ink passage. For this recording head, the base plate and the ink supply member pinch the substrate and the ceiling plate at the contact portion as a fulcrum so as to enable the base plate to press the substrate from the side opposite to the element surface, and the ink supply member to press the ceiling plate from the side opposite from the grooved surface. Thus, the member that enables the ceiling plate and the substrate to be closely in contact, and the member for supplying ink are arranged to be commonly functional as an ink supply member to make it possible to omit the provision of any spring member to be used only for keeping the close contact of the ceiling plate and the substrate, thus curtailing the number of parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/14024 (2013.01); B41J 2/14048 (2013.01); B41J 2/1604 (2013.01); B41J 2/1606 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/164 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164017 A1 20011219; EP 1164017 B1 20050601; DE 60111123 D1 20050707; DE 60111123 T2 20051103; US 2002015081 A1 20020207; US 6499823 B2 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100613

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100613

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60111123 P 20050707

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050601

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI