Global Patent Index - EP 1164027 A2

EP 1164027 A2 2001-12-19 - Ink jet printer with device for avoiding undesirable belt movement

Title (en)

Ink jet printer with device for avoiding undesirable belt movement

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker mit einer Einrichtung zur Vermeidung unerwünschter Riemenbewegungen

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre munie d'un dispositif destiné à éviter les mouvements de courroie indésirables

Publication

EP 1164027 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01000014 A

Priority

  • EP 01000014 A
  • EP 00200622 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet printer wherein a belt (14) transports an image receiving member (20) past a printhead (11) is equipped with guiding means (18) for creating a bulge, d, in said belt (14), extending towards said ink ejecting means (11), thus keeping the "throw distance" constant and/or with rollers (13, 15) for moving the belt (14), one of the rollers having a flange (13b) and being positioned so as to force the belt agains the flange. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/54 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 3/60 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/08 (2006.01); B41J 29/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/60 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B41J 29/023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164027 A2 20011219; EP 1164027 A3 20030813; EP 1164027 B1 20070502; EP 1780028 A2 20070502; EP 1780028 A3 20070509; EP 1780028 B1 20080604

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090213

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090213

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60128181 P 20070614

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 11/00 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 13/08 B

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI