Global Patent Index - EP 1164032 A2

EP 1164032 A2 2001-12-19 - Method for handling a can which contains paint and a holder for such a can

Title (en)

Method for handling a can which contains paint and a holder for such a can

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Handhabung einer Farbdose und Halter für eine solche Dose

Title (fr)

Méthode pour manipuler un pot de peinture et support pour un tel pot

Publication

EP 1164032 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01202042 A

Priority

  • NL 1015349 A
  • NL 1016276 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a holder intended for receiving a can containing paint or a similar material, which holder comprises a closed bottom, an upright edge joining said bottom and a handle. The holder furthermore comprises a few flexible ears, which are connected to parts of the holder that extend upwards from said bottom, in such a manner that, in use, the free ends of the ears remote from said upwardly extending parts of the holder will engage the outer circumference of a can that is present in said holder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44D 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164032 A2 20011219; EP 1164032 A3 20031126

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-09-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI