Global Patent Index - EP 1164079 A1

EP 1164079 A1 2001-12-19 - FILLING MACHINE WITH ROTATING PACK-SILO

Title (en)

FILLING MACHINE WITH ROTATING PACK-SILO

Title (de)

FÜLLMASCHINE MIT ROTIERENDEM PACKSILO

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE REMPLISSAGE AVEC SILO ROTATIF

Publication

EP 1164079 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110042 A

Priority

EP 00110042 A

Abstract (en)

The rotating filling machine(10) is installed above a stationary subframe(13) which is supportable on the floor or ceiling of a building and equipped with a bearing unit. The subframe is designed as a support structure which has several crossing supports(14). The profiles forming the subframe are welded or screwed together. The bearing unit has an internally toothed ball bearing mounted ring(15) with its teeth meshing with a pinion which is driven by a drive(16).

Abstract (de)

Eine rotierende Füllmaschine zum Füllen von Ventilsäcken mit einem rotierend antreibbaren Packsilo, mit mehreren Füllvorrichtungen sowie mit einem Entstaubungsrohr und einer Rückmehlfördereinrichtung soll so gestaltet werden, dass auf einen Freiraum unterhalb der Füllmaschine verzichtet werden kann. Außerdem soll sie beim Hersteller komplett vormontierbar sein. Erfindungsgemäß wird das Packsilo (11) der rotierenden Füllmaschine (10) oberhalb eines Untergestells (13) angeordnet, welches sich auf der Sohle oder einer Decke des Gebäudes abstützt. Im Bereich des Untergestells (13) ist außerdem der zentrale Entstaubungskanal (18), die Rückmehlfördereinrichtung (21) und eine Auffangwanne (19) angeordnet. Der Antrieb des Packsilos (11) erfolgt durch einen Kugeldrehkranz (15) der ebenfalls im Bereich des Untergestells (13) gelagert ist. Die rotierende Füllmaschine ist besonders zum Abfüllen von pulverförmigen oder granulatartigen Schüttgütern in Ventilsäcke geeignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 1/18; B65B 43/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/18 (2006.01); B65B 43/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/18 (2013.01); B65B 43/60 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2512761 B2 19770616

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164079 A1 20011219; EP 1164079 B1 20070905; DE 50014629 D1 20071018; DK 1164079 T3 20080519; ES 2289982 T3 20080216

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014629

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140606

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120513

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080606

2008-05-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2289982 T3

2007-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014629 P 20071018

2007-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES IT LI

2007-06-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FILLING MACHINE WITH ROTATING PACK-SILO

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060405

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK ES IT LI

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010203

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES IT LI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI