Global Patent Index - EP 1164086 A1

EP 1164086 A1 2001-12-19 - Stack of plastic bags in particular bags for automatic machines, with several stacking holes

Title (en)

Stack of plastic bags in particular bags for automatic machines, with several stacking holes

Title (de)

Stapel aus einer Vielzahl von mit Stapelaufnahmen versehenen Beuteln aus Kunststoffolie, insbesondere Automatembeuteln

Title (fr)

Pile des sacs plastiques, en particulier des sacs pour machines automatiques, avec plusieurs trous pour l'empilage

Publication

EP 1164086 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01113247 A

Priority

DE 10028589 A

Abstract (en)

The stack of plastic bags has stack holders(13) located in the region of tear-away sections(11) and close to the corresponding arc-shaped perforation line of the tear-away section. The stack holders with regard to the interlocking points(12) which allow the bags to be held together in the stack lie in an inwards pointing area of the tear-away sections. The stack holders are each formed as a punched hole or as a cross slot. An Independent claim is included for a procedure for the manufacture of stacks of plastic bags.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Stapel aus einer Vielzahl von mit Stapelaufnahmen versehenen Beuteln aus Kunststoffolie, insbesondere Automatenbeuteln, die zum Erreichen eines ansprechenden Äußeren im Bereich von gegenüber liegenden, als Abreißabschnitte (11) ausgebildeten Ecken einer einseitig vorstehenden Klappe (2) Stapelaufnahmen, vorzugsweise in Gestalt von Kreuzschlitzen (13) oder dergleichen Stapelöffnungen, aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/00; B31B 19/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/98 (2006.01); B65D 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/001 (2013.01); B31B 70/984 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164086 A1 20011219; DE 10028589 A1 20020103; DE 10028589 B4 20050317

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050118

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI