Global Patent Index - EP 1164088 A1

EP 1164088 A1 2001-12-19 - Package for tomatoes

Title (en)

Package for tomatoes

Title (de)

Verpackung für Tomaten

Title (fr)

Emballage pour des tomates

Publication

EP 1164088 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500129 A

Priority

EP 00500129 A

Abstract (en)

A package for tomatoes, especially for small sized practically spherical tomatoes, made up of a laminar body (1) divided into two sections (2,3), base (2) and lid (3), joined by a hinge. The base (2) includes numerous semi-spherical cells (5) to lodge the tomatoes and the lid (3) a helmet that rises above the base to lodge the tomatoes. The package includes a special arrangement of protuberances (8) that act as separators and ensure that the tomatoes stored are completed ventilated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/16; B65D 85/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/16 (2006.01); B65D 85/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/162 (2013.01); B65D 85/34 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1033 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164088 A1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041112

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI