Global Patent Index - EP 1164089 A1

EP 1164089 A1 2001-12-19 - Tea bag and method for closing such a bag using a string

Title (en)

Tea bag and method for closing such a bag using a string

Title (de)

Teebeutel und Verfahren zum Verschliessen eines Teebeutels mittels eines Fadens

Title (fr)

Sachet de thé et procédé pour fermer ce sachet avec une ficelle

Publication

EP 1164089 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112148 A

Priority

EP 00112148 A

Abstract (en)

The infusion bag in the top section(6) has two laterally spaced perforations(8,9) lying to the left and right of the bag's longitudinal axis and which pass through a folded-in corner and middle portion of the top section. The thread(3) to form a loop(3a) is guided by one end through one perforation and by its other end through the second perforation. The loop is laid over the top edge(10) of the infusion bag and both ends(3b,3c) of the thread are guided from below through the loop to form a doubly secured knot. An Independent claim is included for a procedure for the sealing of an infusion bag.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Aufgußbeutel (1), insbesondere für Tee, der ein Kopfteil mit eingefalteten Ecken (1a,1b) und einem darüber gefaltenen Mittelteil (1c) aufweist, an dem ein zwei freie Enden (3b,3c) aufweisender Faden (3) befestigt ist, der von der einen Seite des Kopfteils (6) durch ein die umgefalteten Teile durchgreifendes Loch unter Bildung einer auf der anderen Seite des Kopfteils angeordneten Schlaufe (3a) hindurchgeführt und zurückgeführt ist, wobei die beiden freien Enden von unten durch die über die Kopfkante des Aufgußbeutels gelegte Schlaufe durchgezogen sind und durch Anziehen einen Knoten bilden. Die erfindungsgemäße Lösung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß im Kopfteil zwei mit seitlichem Abstand nebeneinander links und rechts der Längsachse des Beutels angeordnete Löcher (8,9) ausgebildet sind, die jeweils eine eingefaltete Ecke und das Mittelteil des Kopfteils durchgreifen, daß der Faden unter Bildung einer Schlaufe mit seinem einen Ende durch das eine Loch und mit seinem anderen Ende durch das zweite Loch geführt ist, daß die Schlaufe über die Kopfkante (10) des Aufgußbeutels gelegt ist und beide Enden des Fadens von unten durch die Schlaufe unter Ausbildung eines doppelt gesicherten Knotens (11) geführt sind. Die Erfindung betrifft weiter ein Verfahren zum Verschließen eines Aufgußbeutels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/00; B65B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/14 (2006.01); B65B 29/04 (2006.01); B65B 51/08 (2006.01); B65D 81/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/812 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/812 (2013.01); B65B 29/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164089 A1 20011219; EP 1164089 B1 20030305; AT 233705 T 20030315; CN 1199824 C 20050504; CN 1326891 A 20011219; DE 50001378 D1 20030410; ES 2193024 T3 20031101; JP 2002002615 A 20020109; JP 4776805 B2 20110921; PL 195562 B1 20071031; PL 347871 A1 20011217; PT 1164089 E 20030731; US 2001053400 A1 20011220; US 2003203074 A1 20031030; US 6746699 B2 20040608; US 7401450 B2 20080722

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50001378

- Representative's name: RAUSCH WANISCHECK-BERGMANN BRINKMANN PARTNERSC, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH & CO. KG#DUESSELDORFER STRASSE 73#D-40667 MEERBUSCH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH & CO. KG#DUESSELDORFER STRASSE 73#D-40667 MEERBUSCH (DE)

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193024 T3

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1164089E

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-06-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001378 P 20030410

2003-04-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI