Global Patent Index - EP 1164100 A2

EP 1164100 A2 2001-12-19 - Attaching label

Title (en)

Attaching label

Title (de)

Befestigungsetikett

Title (fr)

Etiquette de raccordement

Publication

EP 1164100 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113492 A

Priority

DE 10029298 A

Abstract (en)

A label which can be fixed to a surface, comprises an adhesive front side and a non-adhesive rear, as well as two longitudinal edges for changing rollers. A paper carrier is coated with adhesive material (N1). Part of the non-adhesive rear section of the paper carrier has a double sided adhesive tape (DO) which is 0.5-15 mm from the longitudinal edge of the adhesive tape.

Abstract (de)

Klebeband mit klebender Vorderseite und nichtklebender Rückseite sowie zwei Längskanten für den fliegenden Rollenwechsel, mit d) einem Papierträger (f1), der einseitig an der Vorderseite mit einer Selbstklebemasse (N1) beschichtet ist, wobei, e) ein Teil der nichtklebenden Rückseite des Papierträgers (P1) mit einem doppelseitig klebenden Klebeband (DO) ausgerüstet ist, welches einerseits einen Papierträger (PZ) aus Spaltpapier aufweise, der beidseitig mit Selbstklebemasse (N2, N3) beschichtet ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß, f) das doppelseitig klebende Klebeband (DO) in einem Abstand (V) von 0,5 bis 15 mm von der einen Längskante (LK) des Klebandes angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 5/06 (2006.01); B32B 7/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/18 (2006.01); C09J 7/02 (2006.01); C09J 163/00 (2006.01); C09J 177/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46078 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1462 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1476 (2013.01); Y10T 428/149 (2013.01); Y10T 428/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2839 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164100 A2 20011219; EP 1164100 A3 20040512; DE 10029298 A1 20020103; JP 2002096950 A 20020402; US 2002045019 A1 20020418

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060617

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI