Global Patent Index - EP 1164103 A2

EP 1164103 A2 2001-12-19 - Braking means of self-adjusting thread braking devices for weft feeders

Title (en)

Braking means of self-adjusting thread braking devices for weft feeders

Title (de)

Bremse für eine selbstregulierende Fadenbremse einer Schussfadenliefervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Moyens de freinage d'un frein de fil autoréglable pour fournisseur de trame

Publication

EP 1164103 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01111992 A

Priority

IT TO20000514 A

Abstract (en)

A braking means (15') for self-adjusting thread braking devices (14) of weft feeders which comprises a first frustum-shaped body (150), which is substantially flexible both radially and axially, and a second frustum-shaped body (151) which is fitted over the first one and is arranged axially only in the region downstream of the drum of the feeder, over a portion (T) having a suitable length, and is adapted to give the portion of the body of the braking means (15') the rigidity that is necessary and sufficient to transmit to the region of tangency of the body with the drum of the feeder the action applied by the elastic means which press on the braking means (15'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/366 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164103 A2 20011219; EP 1164103 A3 20021106; EP 1164103 B1 20060426; DE 60119032 D1 20060601; DE 60119032 T2 20061026; IT 1320497 B1 20031210; IT TO20000514 A1 20011203; IT TO20000514 D0 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60119032 P 20060601

2006-05-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI