Global Patent Index - EP 1164106 A1

EP 1164106 A1 2001-12-19 - Lifting ring

Title (en)

Lifting ring

Title (de)

Hebering

Title (fr)

Anneau de levage

Publication

EP 1164106 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00870131 A

Priority

EP 00870131 A

Abstract (en)

The lifting ring consists of a body (4) with a ring loop (2), and has a smooth cylindrical shank (6) for inserting into a cavity (10) in the load (12). The shank has an annular groove (8) for an expanding split ring (18) which engages with a an annular recess (14) in the wall of the cavity to hold the lifting ring in place while allowing its shank to rotate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32213 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32975 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164106 A1 20011219; EP 1164106 B1 20061115; AT 345307 T 20061215; DE 60031840 D1 20061228; DE 60031840 T2 20070419; ES 2274774 T3 20070601; PT 1164106 E 20070228; US 2002005645 A1 20020117; US 6478350 B2 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170505

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170615

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170701

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTELPROP S.A., LUXEMBURG/LUXEMBOURG, LU

- Document: DE 60031840

- Effective date: 20130423

2013-06-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60031840

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20130423

2013-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60031840

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

2013-03-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130218

2011-09-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A.

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: S.H.B.L. S.A., LUXEMBURG/LUXEMBOURG, LU

- Document: DE 60031840

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60031840

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60031840

- Representative's name: OFFICE ERNEST T. FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-07-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110704 AND 20110706

2011-06-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070216

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2274774 T3

2007-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070118

2007-02-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070215

2007-02-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070215

2007-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061207

2006-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031840 P 20061228

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-11-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020604

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI