Global Patent Index - EP 1164116 A1

EP 1164116 A1 2001-12-19 - Process for producing a functional high-energy material

Title (en)

Process for producing a functional high-energy material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines funktionalen hochenergetischen Materials

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de matière à haute énergie fonctionelle

Publication

EP 1164116 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810520 A

Priority

EP 00810520 A

Abstract (en)

In the production of a functional, high-energy material with laminar grains containing an energy-rich plasticizer (I) and polymeric desensitizer (II), (I) and (II) is diffused into the absorbent grains in the form of an aqueous emulsion. Independent claims are also included for: (a) functional high-energy material with laminar grains, obtained by introducing (I) and (II) into a green powder, which contains 5-20% of is a specified 2-nitroxyethyl-nitramine (IA) or dinitro-diazaalkane (IB) as (I) with respect to the green powder; (b) green grains for producing a functional high-energy material of this type.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zur Herstellung von Treibladungspulver (TLP) mit schichtartigem Kornaufbau geht von einem Grünpulver aus, welches in wässriger Emulsion mit einem energetischen Weichmacher und einem polymeren Phlegmatisator imprägniert wird. TLP lassen sich so in industriellen Mengen herstellen, indem die gefährliche Direkt-Einarbeitung eines Sprengöls umgangen wird. Die so hergestellten TLP haben ähnliche Eigenschaften und einen ähnlichen Aufbau wie die vorbekannten TLP.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 45/22; C06B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 21/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/22 (2013.01); C06B 21/0083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 1031548 A1 20000830 - NITROCHEMIE GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] US 2337943 A 19431228 - EARNEST SILK CHARLES
  • [Y] US 2771351 A 19561120 - HOLMES RAYMOND S, et al
  • [Y] US 2349048 A 19440516 - HARRY MACKEY BILL, et al
  • [Y] US 5682009 A 19971028 - O'MEARA WILLIAM L [US], et al
  • [Y] US 5520757 A 19960528 - LUTZ ROCCO G [US]
  • [Y] US 3037891 A 19620605 - MAAG RAYMOND H
  • [A] WO 0003960 A1 20000127 - ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC [US]
  • [Y] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 122, no. 24, 12 June 1995, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 294736u, R.V. CARTWRIGHT-: "Volatility of NENA and other energetic plasticizers determined by thermogravimetric analysis" page 233; XP000663789 & PROPELLANTS, EXPLOS., PYROTECH., vol. 20, no. 2, 1995, pages 51 - 57PROPELLANTS, EXPLOS., PYROTECH.19952025157
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 125, no. 16, 14 October 1996, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 200005s, AN-FANG LU ET AL.: "Preliminary study of BuNENA gun propellants" page 283; XP000661099 & Int. Annu. Conf. ICT 1996, 27th(Energetic Materials), 51.1-51.11
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 129, no. 9, 31 August 1998, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 110942y, B. VOGELSANGER ET AL.: "EI-technology. The key for high-performasnce propulsion design" page 811; XP000789695 & Int. Annu. Conf. ICT 1998, 29th(Energetic Materials), 38.1-38.14, Fraunhofer-Institut fuer Chemische Technologie.
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 130, no. 8, 22 February 1999, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 97702u, G.K. GAUTUM ET AL.: "Study of energetic nitramine extruded double-base propellants." page 887; XP000861165 & DEF. SCI. J., vol. 48, no. 2, 1998, pages 235 - 243DEF. SCI. J.1998482235243

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164116 A1 20011219; EP 1164116 B1 20050126; AT 287863 T 20050215; DE 50009362 D1 20050303; ES 2235813 T3 20050716; US 2002043316 A1 20020418; US 7473330 B2 20090106

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170704

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170710

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235813 T3

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401404

2005-05-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009362 P 20050303

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020302

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI