Global Patent Index - EP 1164208 A2

EP 1164208 A2 2001-12-19 - Electroplating method using combination of vibrational flow in plating bath and plating current of pulse

Title (en)

Electroplating method using combination of vibrational flow in plating bath and plating current of pulse

Title (de)

Elektroplattierverfahren mit einer Kombination von schwingender Bewegung im Abscheidungsbad und gepulstem Plattierungsstrom

Title (fr)

Methode d'electrodeposition utilisant une combination de flux vibrationel dans le bain de deposition et de courant pulsé de deposition

Publication

EP 1164208 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112689 A

Priority

  • JP 2000155046 A
  • JP 2000243249 A
  • JP 2001129994 A

Abstract (en)

In an electroplating method, a plating target article (X) disposed so as to be in contact with plating bath (14) is set as a cathode while a metal member disposed so as to be in contact with the plating bath (14) is set as an anode, and a voltage is applied between the cathode and the anode while vibrational flow is induced by vibrating vibrational vanes (16f) which are fixed in multi-stage style to a vibrating rod (16e) vibrating in the plating bath (14) interlockingly with vibration generating means (16d). Plating current flowing from the anode through the plating bath (14) to the cathode is pulsed and alternately set to one of a first state where the plating current keeps a first value I1 for a first time T1 and a second state where the plating current keeps a second value I2 having the same polarity as the first value I1 for a second time T2, the first value I1 being five or more times larger than the second value I2, and the first time T1 being three or more times longer than the second time T2. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/18; C25D 5/08; C25D 7/00; C25D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/08 (2006.01); C25D 5/18 (2006.01); C25D 5/54 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); C25D 7/12 (2006.01); C25D 17/16 (2006.01); C25D 21/10 (2006.01); C25D 21/12 (2006.01); H01L 21/288 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/08 (2013.01); B01F 11/0082 (2013.01); C25D 5/18 (2013.01); C25D 7/12 (2013.01); C25D 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164208 A2 20011219; EP 1164208 A3 20031008; CA 2349156 A1 20011125; CN 1335419 A 20020213; JP 2002121699 A 20020426; KR 100461908 B1 20041214; SG 94828 A1 20030318; TW 526295 B 20030401; US 2001045360 A1 20011129

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 5/18 A

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 5/08 B

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 7/12 B

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 7/00 B

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI