Global Patent Index - EP 1164214 A2

EP 1164214 A2 2001-12-19 - Method and device for dyeing textile materials

Title (en)

Method and device for dyeing textile materials

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Färben von textilen Materialen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la teinture des matières textiles

Publication

EP 1164214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01111716 A

Priority

DE 10029780 A

Abstract (en)

To dye textile materials the dyestuff is applied in a dyeing autoclave (7), where a portion of the dyestuff is pumped from the autoclave through a circuit (5) with an additional vessel (2) where it dwells for reaction chemicals to be added. The chemicals are added in dosages on entering the outflow (3) from the vessel, so that they are carried out by the dyestuff outflow. In the dyeing process of textile materials, the solid reaction chemicals are dissolved by the reaction with the dyestuff. The volume contained in the additional vessel is 1-10% of the volume held in the dyeing autoclave. The dyeing autoclave is held at a static pressure of at least 1 bar. An Independent claim is included for the container for dosing chemicals into the dyestuff flow with a feed channel, where its upper end can be accessed outside the vessel. The lower end of the feed channel is at the outflow opening (3) from the vessel. Preferred Features: The gap between the lower end of the feed channel and the vessel outflow is 1-10 mm and preferably about 25% of the outflow diameter, and it is adjustable. The outflow diameter is smaller than the diameter of the feed channel, at 15-25 mm and preferably 20 mm. At least one beating plate is fitted at the lower end of the feed channel, and the lower end of the channel is covered by a sieve mesh. The feed channel is vertically upright within the additional vessel, or it is pitched at an angle. The additional vessel has a diameter of at least 1.5 times the diameter of the feed channel. Spray rings are at the upper edge of the additional vessel and/or the feed channel, with openings towards the vessel walls or to the feed channel.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Färben von textilen Materialien, wobei der Färbereaktion in einem Färbekessel (7) über eine Bypass-Leitung (5) Reaktionschemikalien, wie insbesondere Salz zur Linearisierung der Färbereaktion, zugeführt werden. Die Zugabe der Chemikalien findet dabei in einem Zusatzbehälter (2) statt, welcher in dem Bypass (5) angeordnet ist. Erfindungsgemäß befindet sich mittig in diesem Zusatzbehälter (2) ein Zufuhrkanal (1), dessen unteres Ende im Einzugsbereich des Abflusses (3) des Zusatzbehälters (2) liegt, so daß alle in den Zufuhrkanal (1) eingegebenen Chemikalien unmittelbar den Zusatzbehälter (2) über den Abfluß (3) verlassen und dem Färbekessel (7) zugeführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164214 A2 20011219; EP 1164214 A3 20020717; EP 1164214 B1 20041117; AT 282731 T 20041215; BR 0102320 A 20020723; DE 10029780 A1 20011220; ES 2231341 T3 20050516; MX PA01006026 A 20041110; PT 1164214 E 20050429

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-03-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-02-26 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090514

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GUTERMANN & CO. A.G.

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-11-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2009-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-27 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20071022

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. BRUNO HAMMER

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231341 T3

2005-05-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050514

2005-05-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050514

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400364

2005-02-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104524 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: MK RO SI

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GUETERMANN & CO. AG

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030115

- Countries: MK

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030115

- Countries: RO

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030115

- Countries: SI

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI