Global Patent Index - EP 1164223 A2

EP 1164223 A2 2001-12-19 - Method and apparatus for determining the degree of compaction during soil compacting

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for determining the degree of compaction during soil compacting

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Verdichtungsgrades bei der Bodenverdichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la détermination du degré de compaction pendant le compactage du sol

Publication

EP 1164223 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112767 A

Priority

DE 10028949 A

Abstract (en)

Oscillatory amplitude of the lower section (2) relative to the upper section (1), is measured at the excitation frequency. The amplitude is determined at up to 60% of the excitation frequency. The quotient of the values is taken as a measurement of the current degree of ground compaction. An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Verdichtungsgrades bei der Bodenverdichtung mittels einer Walze oder einem Plattenrüttler, der aus einem Oberbau und einer vibrierenden Platte besteht. Dabei wird zumindest ein Amplitudenwert der annähernd bei Anregungsfrequenz erfolgenden Schwingung der Platte relativ zum Oberbau und zumindest ein Amplitudenwert zumindest einer bei maximal 60 % der Anregungsfrequenz erfolgenden Schwingung der Platte relativ zum Oberbau ermittelt und aus den vorgenannten Amplitudenwerten der Quotient als Maß für den aktuellen Verdichtungsgrad ermittelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/28; E01C 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/046 (2006.01); E01C 19/28 (2006.01); E01C 19/38 (2006.01); E02D 3/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/38 (2013.01); E01C 19/288 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164223 A2 20011219; EP 1164223 A3 20030917; AU 5013001 A 20011220; CA 2350260 A1 20011216; DE 10028949 A1 20020307; JP 2002030644 A 20020131; US 2002003990 A1 20020110; US 6619125 B2 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061214

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMAG GMBH

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI