Global Patent Index - EP 1164226 A1

EP 1164226 A1 2001-12-19 - EARTHQUAKE-PROOFING REINFORCING METAL FITTING

Title (en)

EARTHQUAKE-PROOFING REINFORCING METAL FITTING

Title (de)

METALLVERBINDUNG ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER ERDBEBENSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

RACCORD METALLIQUE DE RENFORCEMENT PARASISMIQUE

Publication

EP 1164226 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00900926 A

Priority

JP 0000362 W

Abstract (en)

It is an object of the reinforcing holder against vibrations according to the present invention to be mounted on a joining part of architectural structural member such as foundations, columns, beams, and cross-beams or the like to reinforce them so that a wooden building is not broken down, even if strong vibrations are loaded thereupon by an earthquake, a typhoon or the like. The reinforcing holder against vibrations is for joining architectural structural members A and A disposed orthogonally, comprising a first reinforcing base member 1 which is formed of a plate of high tension steel bent by 90 DEG and secured to one architectural structural member A, and a second reinforcing base member 2 which is arranged symmetrically with the first reinforcing base member 1 through a hinge 4 and secured to another architectural structural member A, characterized in that the second reinforcing base member is so designed that the plate of high tension steel is bent by 90 DEG and absorbing members 3 having rubber elasticity are mounted at a plurality of locations thereof, being secured to another architectural structural member A with the absorbing members 3 interposed, and another architectural structural member A is joined to one architectural structural member A. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/26; E04B 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/98 (2006.01); E04B 1/26 (2006.01); E04B 1/58 (2006.01); E04H 9/02 (2006.01); E04H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 9/14 (2013.01); E04B 1/2604 (2013.01); E04H 9/02 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2616 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2644 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2652 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164226 A1 20011219; EP 1164226 A4 20030102; AU 3078800 A 20010807; CA 2365614 A1 20010802; WO 0155521 A1 20010802

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH GB IT LI SE

2004-01-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-01-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021112

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH GB IT LI SE

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/26 A, 7E 04B 1/58 B, 7E 04H 9/02 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH GB IT LI SE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE