Global Patent Index - EP 1164231 A2

EP 1164231 A2 2001-12-19 - Improvements in and relating to insulated walls

Title (en)

Improvements in and relating to insulated walls

Title (de)

Verbesserungen bezüglich gedämmter Mauern

Title (fr)

Améliorations relatives à des murs isolés

Publication

EP 1164231 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01305266 A

Priority

GB 0014769 A

Abstract (en)

The cladding sheet (10) is for use in an insulated wall. The cladding sheet (10) comprises a first external surface having shaped portions (18) defined thereon. The shaped portions (18) increase the adhesion and cohesion between the cladding sheet (10) and a building material to be coated thereon. The building material may be a cementitious slurry to enable brick slips or bricks to be adhered to the external surface of the wall. The shaped portions (18) on the cladding sheet (10) indicate the correct position for the rows of brick slips or bricks. The internal surface of the cladding sheet (10) also includes shaped portions (30) in order to increase the adhesion or cohesion with the internal wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/28; E04G 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/28 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0862 (2013.01); E04C 2/28 (2013.01); E04G 21/1841 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2340530 A 20000223 - KESKIN OZDEMIR [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164231 A2 20011219; EP 1164231 A3 20030604; GB 0014769 D0 20000809; GB 2363404 A 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04C 2/28 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04G 21/18 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 13/08 B

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI