Global Patent Index - EP 1164232 A2

EP 1164232 A2 2001-12-19 - Wrapping of prestressing elements

Title (en)

Wrapping of prestressing elements

Title (de)

Umhüllung von Vorspannelementen

Title (fr)

Enveloppage d'éléments de précontrainte

Publication

EP 1164232 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890179 A

Priority

AT 10362000 A

Abstract (en)

The sheath(2) or casing for stranded pretensioning elements consists of individual elastically or plastically deformable longitudinal strips(3,3',4,4') which are joined together parallel to the longitudinal axis of the tensioning components(1) and connected by butt welding.

Abstract (de)

Umhüllung von Vorspannelementen mit mindestens einem Vorspannglied zum Vorspannen von Betontragwerken, wobei die Umhüllung (2) aus Kunststoffstreifen (3, 3', 4, 4'; 3A, 4A) besteht, welche an den Stoßstellen der Umhüllung (2) stumpfverschweißt werden und Stumpfschweißnähte (6) bilden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/08 (2006.01); E04C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/08 (2013.01); E04C 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164232 A2 20011219; EP 1164232 A3 20020731; AT 410337 B 20030325; AT A10362000 A 20020815

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060903

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060822

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030118

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 5/10 A, 7E 04C 5/08 B

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI