Global Patent Index - EP 1164236 A1

EP 1164236 A1 2001-12-19 - Electronic key with retractable insert

Title (en)

Electronic key with retractable insert

Title (de)

Elektronischer Schlüssel mit herausklappbarem Einsatz

Title (fr)

Clé électronique à insert escamotable

Publication

EP 1164236 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401523 A

Priority

FR 0007519 A

Abstract (en)

The electronic door key has a casing (1) and a key blade (4) pivoted to the casing between a retracted position in a recess in the casing and an extended position for use in a lock. The pivot mounting has recesses to allow the extended key to be set back slightly into the casing. The key is fitted into the locking recesses by movement directly back towards the casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/00; E05B 49/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/04 (2006.01); E05B 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164236 A1 20011219; EP 1164236 B1 20050831; DE 60113001 D1 20051006; FR 2810063 A1 20011214; FR 2810063 B1 20040521

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-03-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60113001 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI