Global Patent Index - EP 1164237 A1

EP 1164237 A1 2001-12-19 - Mechanism for authorizing the movement of an actuation element by the setting of a changeable code and code changing method

Title (en)

Mechanism for authorizing the movement of an actuation element by the setting of a changeable code and code changing method

Title (de)

Mechanismus für die Berechtigung der Bewegung eines Betätigungselements durch Zusammensetzung eines veränderbaren Kodes und Verfahren zur Veränderung eines Kodes

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'autorisation du déplacement d'un organe de commande par composition d'un code modifiable et procédé de changement de code

Publication

EP 1164237 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401566 A

Priority

FR 0007680 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanical code has a casing (26) mounted on the lock with a control handle. Stops (30) are guided in the casing, actuated by push buttons (16) which are accessible from the exterior. A code changing assembly has a cylinder lock to authorize code changing, and is accessible from the exterior at the side of the push buttons.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 37/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 37/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 37/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164237 A1 20011219; FR 2810421 A1 20011221; FR 2810421 B1 20021227

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060419

2005-12-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MECHANISM FOR AUTHORIZING THE MOVEMENT OF AN ACTUATION ELEMENT BY THE SETTING OF A CHANGEABLE CODE AND CODE CHANGING METH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOKOD

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRETON, JACQUES PAUL

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020611

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI