Global Patent Index - EP 1164243 A2

EP 1164243 A2 2001-12-19 - Guiding device for sliding door wings

Title (en)

Guiding device for sliding door wings

Title (de)

Führungseinrichtung für verschiebbare Türblätter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage pour panneaux de portes coulissants

Publication

EP 1164243 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01101500 A

Priority

IT MI20001345 A

Abstract (en)

Guide profiles (21,21') are positioned on the front side o f the main furniture body (1) on the upper and lower sides. The guide profiles are swivel mounted on a vertical axle on the outer sides of each furniture body. Each upper guide profile has ridges (22,23) for runner-rollers (24,25) to run along. The runner rollers operate in conjunction with the movable door-leaves.

Abstract (de)

Führungseinrichtung für verschiebbare Türblätter eines Schrankes, wobei an der Vorderseite des Möbelstückes oben und unten Führungsprofile angeordnet sind und diese Führungsprofile an den aussenliegenden Seiten eines jeden Möbelkorpus um eine senkrechte Achse verschwenkbar gelagert sind und jedes obere Führungsprofil Ablaufrippen für Führungsrollen aufweist und diese Führungsrollen mit den verschiebbaren Türblättern wirkverbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/10 (2006.01); E05D 15/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/1065 (2013.01); E05D 15/58 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1078 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164243 A2 20011219; EP 1164243 A3 20040128; IT 1318008 B1 20030721; IT MI20001345 A1 20011217; IT MI20001345 D0 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-11-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI