Global Patent Index - EP 1164246 A2

EP 1164246 A2 2001-12-19 - Lock mechanism for safe doors

Title (en)

Lock mechanism for safe doors

Title (de)

Riegelwerk für eine Tresortür

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage pour une porte d'un coffre-fort

Publication

EP 1164246 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01106016 A

Priority

DE 10029120 A

Abstract (en)

The first bascule rod (32) is movable in a transverse direction; at least one second bascule rod (33) is movable in a lengthwise direction. Both bascule rods are drive by a cog wheel (35) mounted in the base plate (31). The bolt of the lock fits into one of the bascule rods. The first bascule rod has chamfered locking arms (32b,32c) resting against the edges of the second bascule rod which has cavities (33a) into which the locking arms of the first bascule rod fit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befasst sich mit einem Riegelwerk für eine Tresortür. Diese Riegelwerke weisen wenigstens zwei im rechten Winkel zueinander bewegliche Baskülestangen (32, 33) auf, die durch Sperrschlösser gesichert werden. Als Antriebselement wird ein Zahnrad (35) benutzt, das in gezahnte Bereiche der Baskülestangen (32, 33) eingreift. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, das Riegelwerk gegen Gewaltangriffe von außen sicherer zu machen. Erfindungsgemäß gelingt dies dadurch, dass die erste Baskülestange (32) abgekantete Sperrstege (32b, 32c) aufweist, die an den Kanten der zweiten Baskülestange (33) anliegen, dass die zweite Baskülestange (33) mit Vorlauf angetrieben ist und dass die zweite Baskülestange (33) Aussparungen (33a) aufweist, in die die Sperrstege (32b, 32c) der ersten Baskülestange (32) eintauchen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/04; E05B 17/20; E05B 63/14; E05B 65/00; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/00 (2006.01); E05G 1/04 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/04 (2013.01); E05B 65/0075 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01); E05B 17/2038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164246 A2 20011219; EP 1164246 A3 20040204; DE 10029120 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-12-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05G 1/04 A

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/00 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 63/14 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 17/20 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/00 B

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABA MAUER GMBH

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI