Global Patent Index - EP 1164249 A1

EP 1164249 A1 2001-12-19 - SPHERICAL POSITIVE-DISPLACEMENT ROTARY MACHINE

Title (en)

SPHERICAL POSITIVE-DISPLACEMENT ROTARY MACHINE

Title (de)

SPHÄRISCHE, ROTIERENDE VERDRÄNGERMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE ROTATIVE VOLUMETRIQUE SPHERIQUE

Publication

EP 1164249 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00909826 A

Priority

  • RU 0000070 W
  • RU 99106138 A
  • RU 99111234 A
  • RU 99111235 A
  • RU 99111237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057028A1] The present invention relates to a spherical positive-displacement machine that can be used as an engine, a pump or a compressor. The machine includes a body comprising two parts (1, 2) in which the spherical cavity comprises three rotors (4, 5, 6). The central disc rotor (4) is connected on both sides through a diametrical hinge to the sectorial rotors (5, 6). The rotors (4, 5, 6) define four chambers (9, 10, 11, 12), while the radial chamber-defining surfaces of the rotors (4, 5, 6) have a circular shape. Inlet-outlet channels (15, 16, 17, 18) are provided in the sectorial-rotor closure area during the cycle changes within the chambers, wherein said channels include a nozzle portion and have a tangential inclination. The diametrical hinge of the sectorial rotor (6) includes two connected semi-axes (21, 22) having their journals extending into the meniscus of a spherical form (25), while the second diametrical hinge (5) comprises a solid cylindrical axis. The half-bodies (1, 2) include a centering device (3) that allow for the modification of the phase definition angle and of the machine precession. A channel network (26, 27, 28, 29, 30) is provided in the rotor unit for lubricating and cooling the same. The machine body further includes an oil discharge and drainage slot device (33), while a gap is provided between the portions of the body (1, 2) and the shafts (7, 8) for assembling the machine.

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemäße sphärische Rotor-Verdrängungsmaschine ist zur Verwendung als Motor, Pumpe oder Verdichter bestimmt und enthält ein aus zwei Teilen 1 und 2 bestehendes Gehäuse, in dessen sphärischem Hohlraum sich drei Rotoren 4, 5 und 6 befinden, wobei der zentrale Scheibenrotor 4 auf jeder Seite durch ein Diametralgelenk mit den Sektorrotoren 5 und 6 verbunden ist. Die Rotoren 4, 5 und 6 bilden vier Kammern 9, 10, 11 und 12. Die kammerbildenden radialen Oberflächen der Rotoren 4, 5 und 6 haben eine Radiusform. Die Einlass-Auslasskanäle 15, 16, 17 und 18 sind in der Zone der Überdeckung durch die Sektorrotoren im Augenblick des Wechsels der Zyklen in den Kammern angeordnet, wobei die Kanäle einen Düsenabschnitt und eine tangentiale Neigung aufweisen. Das Diametralgelenk des Sektorrotors 6 verfügt über zwei befestigte Halbachsen 21 und 22, deren Zapfen in einen Meniskus 25 sphärischer Form hineinragen; das zweite Diametralgelenk des Sektorrotors 5 besitzt eine ungeteilte zylindrische Achse. Die Gehäusehälften 1 und 2 sind mit einer Zentriereinrichtung 3 versehen, die es gestattet, den phasenbestimmenden Winkel und die Präzision der Maschine zu verändern. Die Schmierung und Kühlung der Rotorbaugruppe erfolgen über ein darin befindliches Netz von Kanälen 25, 27, 28, 29 und 30. Im Maschinengehäuse ist eine schlitzartige Ölfang-Dränageeinrichtung 33 vorgesehen. Zwischen den Gehäuseteilen 1, 2 und den Wellen 7 ist ein Spalt vorhanden, der die Montierbarkeit der Maschine sicherstellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 3/06 (2006.01); F04C 2/00 (2006.01); F04C 3/06 (2006.01); F04C 18/00 (2006.01); F04C 18/063 (2006.01); F04C 18/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057028 A1 20000928; AU 3200800 A 20001009; EP 1164249 A1 20011219; EP 1164249 A4 20030723; JP 2002540333 A 20021126; US 6579081 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031212

2003-07-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINPAR HOLDING S.A.

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FINPAR HOLDING S.A.

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE