Global Patent Index - EP 1164251 A1

EP 1164251 A1 2001-12-19 - Rotor blade locking means

Title (en)

Rotor blade locking means

Title (de)

Schloss zur Sicherung von Laufschaufeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage d'aubes à attaches marteau sur un disque

Publication

EP 1164251 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401535 A

Priority

FR 0007610 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing for turbine blades with hammer shaped roots set in a turbine disc groove (2) and inserted through a loading aperture has a body (15) located between the roots of two adjacent blades and with its base (20) located over the bottom of the groove. The body of the fixing has a transverse radial aperture of non-circular section for a locking element (16) adjusted and fixed in place by a screw (17), the head of which is held between the base of the body and the bottom of the groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/30; F01D 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F01D 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/32 (2013.01); F01D 5/3038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164251 A1 20011219; EP 1164251 B1 20060104; CA 2349692 A1 20011215; CA 2349692 C 20090113; DE 60116460 D1 20060330; DE 60116460 T2 20060907; ES 2251446 T3 20060501; FR 2810366 A1 20011221; FR 2810366 B1 20021011; JP 2002021504 A 20020123; JP 4043733 B2 20080206; RU 2222700 C2 20040127; US 2001055527 A1 20011227; US 6464463 B2 20021015; WO 0196711 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES

- Effective date: 20170717

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130615

2014-10-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141010

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251446 T3

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60116460 P 20060330

2006-01-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040512

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI